U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:21-cr-00015-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Ibarra Hernandez
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2021
  • September 24, 2021: [Judgment Returned Executed]
August, 2021
  • August 12, 2021: [Judgment - Statement of Reasons]
  • August 12, 2021: [Judgment]
  • August 02, 2021: [Sentencing]
March, 2021
  • March 09, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report]
February, 2021
  • February 24, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • February 11, 2021: [Notice of PSI Interview Preference]
  • February 11, 2021: [Acceptance of Guilty Plea]
  • February 11, 2021: [Plea Hearing - Straight Up]
  • February 11, 2021: [Arraignment]
  • February 11, 2021: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • February 05, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
January, 2021
  • January 29, 2021: [Factual Basis]
  • January 22, 2021: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.