U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 7:21-cr-00008-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Locklear
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
February, 2022
  • February 17, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • February 15, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Document ]
  • February 04, 2022: [Judgment ]
  • February 03, 2022: [Sentencing ]
January, 2022
  • January 26, 2022: [Seal Document]
  • January 26, 2022: [PROPOSED SEALED Document]
  • January 25, 2022: [Departure - Sentencing Guidelines]
  • January 24, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
  • January 10, 2022: [Objection to PSI]
  • January 04, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Sentencing]
December, 2021
  • December 31, 2021: [Continue Sentencing]
  • December 21, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • December 20, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Document ]
  • December 17, 2021: [Objection to PSI]
  • December 13, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report -Draft]
October, 2021
  • October 21, 2021: [Document]
  • October 21, 2021: [Plea Agreement ]
  • October 21, 2021: [Arraignment ]
  • October 21, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • October 06, 2021: [Reminder to Counsel - Judge Boyle]
  • October 06, 2021: [Proposed Voir Dire]
  • October 06, 2021: [Proposed Jury Instructions ]
  • October 06, 2021: [Notice-other]
September, 2021
  • September 22, 2021: [Arraignment ]
  • September 22, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
August, 2021
  • August 27, 2021: [Waiver of Initial Appearance on Superseding Indictment]
  • August 19, 2021: [Notice of Waiver of Initial Appearance on Superseding Indictment]
  • August 19, 2021: [Indictment ]
  • August 19, 2021: [Unredacted Document]
  • August 19, 2021: [Penalty Sheet]
  • August 09, 2021: [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
  • August 09, 2021: [Transcript]
July, 2021
  • July 16, 2021: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel - USA]
June, 2021
  • June 16, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • June 15, 2021: [Continue ]
  • June 10, 2021: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Document ]
  • June 10, 2021: [Arraignment ]
  • June 10, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • June 04, 2021: [Leave to File Document ]
  • June 03, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • June 03, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
May, 2021
  • May 31, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Document ]
  • May 31, 2021: [Continue ]
  • May 25, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • May 11, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • May 11, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • May 06, 2021: [Continue ]
  • May 06, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Document ]
April, 2021
  • April 01, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
March, 2021
  • March 31, 2021: [Motion Submitted]
  • March 31, 2021: [Continue ]
  • March 01, 2021: [Order]
  • March 01, 2021: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
  • March 01, 2021: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • March 01, 2021: [Detention Hearing ]
February, 2021
  • February 24, 2021: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • February 19, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • February 18, 2021: [Continue ]
  • February 18, 2021: [Request for Discovery]
  • February 18, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • February 17, 2021: [Scheduling Order ]
  • February 17, 2021: [Order of Detention - Temporary]
  • February 17, 2021: [Initial Appearance ]
  • February 17, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 17, 2021: [Order]
  • February 17, 2021: [Oral Order]
  • February 17, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • February 17, 2021: [Detention]
  • February 17, 2021: [Arrest ]
  • February 17, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • February 16, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • February 16, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued ]
  • February 15, 2021: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • February 13, 2021: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • February 11, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued ]
  • February 11, 2021: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • February 11, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
January, 2021
  • January 25, 2021: [Warrant Issued ]
  • January 25, 2021: [Penalty Sheet]
  • January 25, 2021: [Unredacted Document]
  • January 25, 2021: [Warrant Requested]
  • January 25, 2021: [Indictment ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.