U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 7:21-cr-00009-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Yoc-Cinto
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 13, 2022: [Judgment ]
September, 2022
  • September 28, 2022: [Sentencing ]
  • September 13, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
July, 2022
  • July 07, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
May, 2022
  • May 17, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Sentencing]
  • May 16, 2022: [Continue Sentencing]
  • May 02, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
April, 2022
  • April 21, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
  • April 14, 2022: [Objection to PSI]
March, 2022
  • March 31, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report -Draft]
February, 2022
  • February 16, 2022: [Consent to Magistrate Arraignment]
  • February 16, 2022: [Arraignment ]
  • February 16, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • February 16, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 01, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
January, 2022
  • January 18, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • January 18, 2022: [Continue ]
December, 2021
  • December 22, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • December 07, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • December 06, 2021: [Continue ]
November, 2021
  • November 23, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
October, 2021
  • October 15, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • October 15, 2021: [Motion Referred]
  • October 14, 2021: [Continue ]
  • October 04, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
August, 2021
  • August 24, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • August 24, 2021: [Motion Submitted]
  • August 23, 2021: [Continue ]
  • August 03, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
June, 2021
  • June 23, 2021: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • June 23, 2021: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
  • June 23, 2021: [Detention Hearing ]
  • June 21, 2021: [Scheduling Order ]
  • June 19, 2021: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • June 17, 2021: [Request for Discovery]
  • June 17, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 16, 2021: [Text Order]
  • June 16, 2021: [Order of Detention - Temporary]
  • June 16, 2021: [Oral Order]
  • June 16, 2021: [Detention]
  • June 16, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • June 16, 2021: [Initial Appearance ]
  • June 16, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • June 16, 2021: [Arrest ]
  • June 16, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • June 15, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued ]
  • June 15, 2021: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • June 11, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued ]
  • June 11, 2021: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • June 11, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
January, 2021
  • January 25, 2021: [Warrant Requested]
  • January 25, 2021: [Warrant Issued ]
  • January 25, 2021: [Penalty Sheet]
  • January 25, 2021: [Indictment ]
  • January 25, 2021: [Unredacted Document]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.