U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:21-cr-00007-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Phillips
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 18, 2022: [USCA Mandate]
September, 2022
  • September 26, 2022: [USCA Judgment]
  • September 26, 2022: [Opinion from USCA]
July, 2022
  • July 22, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
May, 2022
  • May 25, 2022: [Assembled Electronic Record on Appeal transmitted to 4CCA]
April, 2022
  • April 28, 2022: [Document]
  • April 20, 2022: [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
  • April 20, 2022: [Transcript - Appeal]
February, 2022
  • February 25, 2022: [USCA Order]
  • February 25, 2022: [USCA Case Number ]
  • February 23, 2022: [Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA]
  • February 23, 2022: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • February 22, 2022: [Judgment ]
  • February 17, 2022: [Sentencing ]
  • February 11, 2022: [Order on Motion to Seal ]
  • February 10, 2022: [Seal ]
  • February 10, 2022: [PROPOSED SEALED Motion]
  • February 10, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
  • February 01, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
January, 2022
  • January 18, 2022: [Objection to PSI]
December, 2021
  • December 15, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • December 14, 2021: [Extension of Time]
November, 2021
  • November 17, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • November 17, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Sentencing]
  • November 16, 2021: [Extension of Time]
  • November 16, 2021: [Continue Sentencing]
  • November 10, 2021: [Objection to PSI]
  • November 04, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report -Draft]
September, 2021
  • September 23, 2021: [Plea Agreement ]
  • September 22, 2021: [Consent to Magistrate Arraignment]
  • September 22, 2021: [Arraignment ]
  • September 22, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 22, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • September 01, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
June, 2021
  • June 30, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • June 30, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • June 29, 2021: [Extension of Time]
  • June 29, 2021: [Continue ]
  • June 07, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • June 07, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • June 03, 2021: [Extension of Time]
  • June 03, 2021: [Continue ]
April, 2021
  • April 30, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • April 30, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • April 29, 2021: [Extension of Time]
  • April 29, 2021: [Continue ]
March, 2021
  • March 29, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • March 29, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • March 26, 2021: [Extension of Time]
  • March 26, 2021: [Continue ]
  • March 02, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • March 02, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • March 02, 2021: [Motion Submitted]
  • March 01, 2021: [Extension of Time]
  • March 01, 2021: [Continue ]
February, 2021
  • February 07, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • February 04, 2021: [Scheduling Order ]
  • February 03, 2021: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • February 03, 2021: [Detention Hearing ]
  • February 03, 2021: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • February 02, 2021: [Request for Discovery]
  • February 02, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • February 01, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
January, 2021
  • January 29, 2021: [Order]
  • January 29, 2021: [Order of Detention - Temporary]
  • January 29, 2021: [Detention]
  • January 29, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • January 29, 2021: [Oral Order]
  • January 29, 2021: [Initial Appearance ]
  • January 29, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • January 28, 2021: [Arrest ]
  • January 28, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 25, 2021: [Warrant Issued ]
  • January 25, 2021: [Penalty Sheet]
  • January 25, 2021: [Indictment ]
  • January 25, 2021: [Unredacted Document]
  • January 25, 2021: [Warrant Requested]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.