U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:21-cr-00006-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Cruz
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2021
  • September 07, 2021: [Judgment ]
  • September 07, 2021: [Sentencing ]
July, 2021
  • July 21, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
  • July 12, 2021: [Objection to PSI]
June, 2021
  • June 30, 2021: [Objection to PSI]
  • June 23, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report -Draft]
May, 2021
  • May 01, 2021: [Plea Agreement ]
  • May 01, 2021: [Arraignment ]
  • May 01, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
March, 2021
  • March 18, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • March 17, 2021: [Motion Submitted]
  • March 17, 2021: [Continue ]
  • March 04, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
February, 2021
  • February 03, 2021: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • February 03, 2021: [Detention]
  • February 03, 2021: [Detention Hearing ]
  • February 02, 2021: [Pretrial Services Report]
January, 2021
  • January 29, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • January 29, 2021: [Scheduling Order ]
  • January 29, 2021: [Order]
  • January 29, 2021: [Request for Discovery]
  • January 29, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • January 28, 2021: [Order of Detention - Temporary]
  • January 28, 2021: [Initial Appearance ]
  • January 28, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • January 28, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • January 27, 2021: [Arrest ]
  • January 27, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 25, 2021: [Penalty Sheet]
  • January 25, 2021: [Warrant Issued ]
  • January 25, 2021: [Indictment ]
  • January 25, 2021: [Unredacted Document]
  • January 25, 2021: [Warrant Requested]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.