U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:07-cr-00018-2
  • Case Name: USA v. Raynor et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2021
  • March 03, 2021: [Order]
  • March 02, 2021: [Proposed Order]
  • March 01, 2021: [Answer to Writ of Garnishment]
February, 2021
  • February 08, 2021: [Certificate of Service ]
  • February 05, 2021: [Writ of Garnishment Issued]
  • February 04, 2021: [Motion Referred to Clerk]
January, 2021
  • January 25, 2021: [Application for Writ]
  • January 25, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.