U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:21-cr-00004-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Mitchell
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2021
  • December 21, 2021: [Judgment ]
  • December 13, 2021: [Sentencing ]
  • December 07, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
November, 2021
  • November 23, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • November 19, 2021: [Objection to PSI]
  • November 15, 2021: [Objection to PSI]
  • November 08, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report -Draft]
September, 2021
  • September 23, 2021: [Plea Agreement ]
  • September 22, 2021: [Consent to Magistrate Arraignment]
  • September 22, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • September 22, 2021: [Arraignment ]
  • September 22, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 01, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
July, 2021
  • July 26, 2021: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel- Defendant]
  • July 09, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • July 09, 2021: [Motion Referred]
  • July 09, 2021: [Continue ]
June, 2021
  • June 25, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
April, 2021
  • April 22, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • April 22, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • April 22, 2021: [Extension of Time]
  • April 22, 2021: [Continue ]
March, 2021
  • March 03, 2021: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
February, 2021
  • February 23, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • February 23, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • February 22, 2021: [Extension of Time]
  • February 22, 2021: [Continue ]
  • February 19, 2021: [Order]
  • February 19, 2021: [Detention Hearing ]
  • February 19, 2021: [Exhibit List ]
  • February 18, 2021: [Response in Opposition]
  • February 18, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • February 18, 2021: [Motion Submitted]
  • February 18, 2021: [Continue ]
  • February 10, 2021: [Appeal of Magistrate Judge Order]
  • February 05, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release ]
  • February 05, 2021: [Exhibit List ]
  • February 05, 2021: [Detention Hearing ]
  • February 05, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 04, 2021: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • February 01, 2021: [Scheduling Order ]
January, 2021
  • January 29, 2021: [Request for Discovery]
  • January 29, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • January 29, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • January 29, 2021: [Order]
  • January 29, 2021: [Order of Detention - Temporary]
  • January 29, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • January 29, 2021: [Oral Order]
  • January 29, 2021: [Detention]
  • January 29, 2021: [Initial Appearance ]
  • January 29, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • January 28, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 28, 2021: [Arrest ]
  • January 25, 2021: [Warrant Issued ]
  • January 25, 2021: [Penalty Sheet]
  • January 25, 2021: [Indictment ]
  • January 25, 2021: [Unredacted Document]
  • January 25, 2021: [Warrant Requested]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.