U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00017-1
  • Case Name: USA v. HARGROVE
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 02, 2022: [Order on Motion for Early Termination of Supervision]
October, 2022
  • October 24, 2022: [SEALED Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
  • October 24, 2022: [SEALED Statement of Reasons]
  • October 14, 2022: [Motion Submitted]
  • October 13, 2022: [Response to Motion]
September, 2022
  • September 27, 2022: [SEALED USPO Response - Defendant Motion for Early Term]
  • September 16, 2022: [Case Reassigned]
  • September 08, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • September 07, 2022: [Early Termination of Supervision]
January, 2021
  • January 25, 2021: [SEALED Attachments to Main Document]
  • January 25, 2021: [Transfer In/Supervised Release/Probation Transfer]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.