U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00001-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Ager
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 20, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • October 05, 2022: [Judgment - Statement of Reasons]
  • October 05, 2022: [Judgment]
  • October 03, 2022: [Sentencing]
July, 2022
  • July 14, 2022: [Service by Publication]
  • July 14, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
June, 2022
  • June 29, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
May, 2022
  • May 16, 2022: [Notice of Cancellation of Hearing]
  • May 16, 2022: [Judgment of Forfeiture]
  • May 16, 2022: [Notice of PSI Interview Preference]
  • May 16, 2022: [Acceptance of Guilty Plea]
  • May 16, 2022: [Plea Hearing]
  • May 16, 2022: [Factual Basis]
  • May 10, 2022: [Set/Reset Motion and M&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • May 09, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • May 09, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 09, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Document]
  • May 09, 2022: [Notice of Hearing Plea - Asheville]
  • May 09, 2022: [Factual Basis]
  • May 06, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
April, 2022
  • April 29, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • April 29, 2022: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • April 28, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • April 22, 2022: [Memorandum in Support]
  • April 22, 2022: [Suppress]
March, 2022
  • March 10, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • March 09, 2022: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
January, 2022
  • January 18, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • January 10, 2022: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
November, 2021
  • November 19, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • November 05, 2021: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
September, 2021
  • September 23, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • September 20, 2021: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
August, 2021
  • August 25, 2021: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • August 25, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • August 24, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
July, 2021
  • July 16, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • July 13, 2021: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
May, 2021
  • May 14, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • May 07, 2021: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
March, 2021
  • March 25, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • March 23, 2021: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
February, 2021
  • February 22, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • February 22, 2021: [Standard Discovery Order]
  • February 22, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • February 22, 2021: [Arraignment and Detention]
  • February 19, 2021: [Pretrial Report]
  • February 18, 2021: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • February 17, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • February 17, 2021: [Oral Order Appointing Counsel]
  • February 17, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • February 17, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • February 16, 2021: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • February 16, 2021: [Arrest]
January, 2021
  • January 25, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.