U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 7:21-cr-00011-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Drye
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 24, 2023: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • January 24, 2023: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 20, 2023: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 16, 2023: [Notice of Hearing ]
September, 2022
  • September 15, 2022: [PETITION and ORDER for Action on Pretrial Release]
July, 2022
  • July 08, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
June, 2022
  • June 08, 2022: [Objection to PSI]
February, 2022
  • February 06, 2022: [SEALED Order]
  • February 06, 2022: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • February 06, 2022: [Notice of Correction]
  • February 05, 2022: [Seal Document]
  • February 05, 2022: [PROPOSED SEALED Document]
January, 2022
  • January 10, 2022: [SEALED Order]
  • January 10, 2022: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • January 08, 2022: [Seal Document]
  • January 08, 2022: [PROPOSED SEALED Motion]
  • January 07, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report -Draft]
November, 2021
  • November 17, 2021: [Order Setting/Resetting Hearings]
  • November 16, 2021: [Consent to Magistrate Arraignment]
  • November 16, 2021: [Plea Agreement ]
  • November 16, 2021: [Arraignment ]
  • November 09, 2021: [Release Status Report]
October, 2021
  • October 20, 2021: [Order]
  • October 18, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • October 18, 2021: [Withdrawal of Motion]
  • October 18, 2021: [Bond Revocation Hearing ]
  • October 14, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • October 14, 2021: [Motion Referred]
  • October 14, 2021: [Continue ]
July, 2021
  • July 30, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • July 30, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • July 29, 2021: [Continue ]
  • July 29, 2021: [Extension of Time]
June, 2021
  • June 22, 2021: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct ]
  • June 21, 2021: [Amend/Correct ]
  • June 21, 2021: [Proposed Order]
  • June 17, 2021: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • June 17, 2021: [Motion Submitted]
  • June 17, 2021: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • June 06, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • June 06, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • June 04, 2021: [Continue ]
  • June 04, 2021: [Extension of Time]
March, 2021
  • March 23, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • March 23, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • March 22, 2021: [Continue ]
  • March 22, 2021: [Extension of Time]
February, 2021
  • February 25, 2021: [Request for Discovery]
  • February 25, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • February 24, 2021: [Scheduling Order ]
  • February 24, 2021: [Text Order]
  • February 24, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release ]
  • February 24, 2021: [Oral Order]
  • February 24, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • February 24, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • February 24, 2021: [Initial Appearance ]
  • February 23, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • February 22, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 22, 2021: [Arrest ]
January, 2021
  • January 25, 2021: [Penalty Sheet]
  • January 25, 2021: [Warrant Requested]
  • January 25, 2021: [Warrant Issued ]
  • January 25, 2021: [Indictment ]
  • January 25, 2021: [Unredacted Document]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.