U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cr-00029-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Patterson
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 12, 2023: [Notice-other]
  • January 12, 2023: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • January 04, 2023: [Document]
July, 2022
  • July 12, 2022: [Judgment ]
  • July 11, 2022: [Sentencing ]
May, 2022
  • May 25, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Sentencing]
  • May 24, 2022: [Continue Sentencing]
  • May 05, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
April, 2022
  • April 22, 2022: [Objection to PSI]
  • April 11, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report -Draft]
  • April 01, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
March, 2022
  • March 25, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • March 23, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • March 22, 2022: [Document]
  • March 17, 2022: [Proposed Order]
February, 2022
  • February 17, 2022: [SEALED Document]
  • February 16, 2022: [Plea Agreement ]
  • February 16, 2022: [Arraignment ]
  • February 16, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
January, 2022
  • January 04, 2022: [Motion Hearing ]
  • January 04, 2022: [Continue ]
December, 2021
  • December 29, 2021: [Continue ]
November, 2021
  • November 10, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 09, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
October, 2021
  • October 07, 2021: [Continue ]
September, 2021
  • September 30, 2021: [Letter]
  • September 01, 2021: [Motion Hearing ]
August, 2021
  • August 27, 2021: [Notice of Hearing on Motion ]
  • August 18, 2021: [Appoint Counsel ]
  • August 18, 2021: [Withdrawal of Motion]
  • August 10, 2021: [Letter]
  • August 06, 2021: [Appoint Counsel ]
July, 2021
  • July 22, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • July 22, 2021: [Continue ]
April, 2021
  • April 29, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • April 29, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • April 26, 2021: [Extension of Time]
  • April 26, 2021: [Continue ]
  • April 23, 2021: [Extension of Time]
  • April 23, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
March, 2021
  • March 23, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • March 23, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • March 18, 2021: [Extension of Time]
  • March 18, 2021: [Continue ]
February, 2021
  • February 11, 2021: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • February 11, 2021: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • February 11, 2021: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
  • February 11, 2021: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • February 10, 2021: [Scheduling Order ]
  • February 10, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • February 09, 2021: [Request for Discovery]
  • February 09, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • February 09, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued ]
  • February 09, 2021: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • February 09, 2021: [Text Order]
  • February 09, 2021: [Order of Detention - Temporary]
  • February 09, 2021: [Detention]
  • February 09, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • February 09, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • February 09, 2021: [Initial Appearance ]
  • February 09, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 09, 2021: [Arrest ]
  • February 02, 2021: [Motion Submitted]
  • February 02, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued ]
  • February 02, 2021: [Amended Penalty Sheet]
  • February 02, 2021: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • February 02, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
January, 2021
  • January 25, 2021: [Penalty Sheet]
  • January 25, 2021: [Unredacted Document]
  • January 25, 2021: [Warrant Requested]
  • January 25, 2021: [Warrant Issued ]
  • January 25, 2021: [Indictment ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.