U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cr-00028-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Carver
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2024
  • October 11, 2024: [Request for Discovery]
  • October 11, 2024: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 10, 2024: [Order]
  • October 10, 2024: [Oral Order]
  • October 10, 2024: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • October 10, 2024: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • October 10, 2024: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
December, 2021
  • December 10, 2021: [Judgment ]
  • December 08, 2021: [Order for Forfeiture of Property]
  • December 08, 2021: [Sentencing ]
November, 2021
  • November 18, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • November 16, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
  • November 03, 2021: [Objection to PSI]
  • November 01, 2021: [Objection to PSI]
September, 2021
  • September 10, 2021: [Plea Agreement ]
  • September 08, 2021: [Consent to Magistrate Arraignment]
  • September 08, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • September 08, 2021: [Arraignment ]
  • September 08, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
August, 2021
  • August 09, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
July, 2021
  • July 23, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • July 22, 2021: [Continue ]
  • July 09, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
June, 2021
  • June 07, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • June 07, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • June 02, 2021: [Motion Submitted]
  • June 02, 2021: [Extension of Time]
  • June 02, 2021: [Continue ]
May, 2021
  • May 14, 2021: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • May 14, 2021: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
  • May 07, 2021: [Order]
  • May 07, 2021: [Docket Call]
  • May 07, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 07, 2021: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • May 05, 2021: [Scheduling Order ]
  • May 05, 2021: [Request for Discovery]
  • May 05, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • May 05, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 04, 2021: [Text Order]
  • May 04, 2021: [Order of Detention - Temporary]
  • May 04, 2021: [Initial Appearance ]
  • May 04, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 04, 2021: [Detention]
  • May 04, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • May 04, 2021: [Arrest ]
  • May 04, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • May 03, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
January, 2021
  • January 25, 2021: [Penalty Sheet]
  • January 25, 2021: [Warrant Issued ]
  • January 25, 2021: [Unredacted Document]
  • January 25, 2021: [Warrant Requested]
  • January 25, 2021: [Indictment ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.