U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cr-00026-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Desgroux
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2022
  • May 06, 2022: [Order on Motion for Revocation of Supervised Release]
  • May 05, 2022: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
April, 2022
  • April 27, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • April 14, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • April 14, 2022: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • April 12, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
March, 2022
  • March 16, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 11, 2022: [Motion for Revocation of Supervised Release]
September, 2021
  • September 21, 2021: [Judgment ]
  • September 13, 2021: [Sentencing ]
August, 2021
  • August 26, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
  • August 20, 2021: [Objection to PSI]
  • August 19, 2021: [Objection to PSI]
  • August 09, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • August 04, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report -Draft]
June, 2021
  • June 17, 2021: [Plea Agreement ]
  • June 09, 2021: [Consent to Magistrate Arraignment]
  • June 09, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • June 09, 2021: [Arraignment ]
  • June 09, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 04, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
May, 2021
  • May 11, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
March, 2021
  • March 24, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • March 24, 2021: [Docket Call]
  • March 24, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 24, 2021: [Continue ]
  • March 22, 2021: [Motion Referred]
  • March 22, 2021: [Continue ]
  • March 03, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
January, 2021
  • January 27, 2021: [Scheduling Order ]
  • January 26, 2021: [Order - Written Order Following Oral Order on Motion]
  • January 26, 2021: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • January 26, 2021: [Detention Hearing ]
  • January 25, 2021: [Penalty Sheet]
  • January 25, 2021: [Unredacted Document]
  • January 25, 2021: [Indictment ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.