U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:12-cr-00420-1
  • Case Name: USA v. ROY
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
February, 2021
  • February 26, 2021: [Notice to Receiving District of Criminal Case Transfer]
  • February 26, 2021: [Transfer Out/Probationer]
  • February 12, 2021: [Order On Probation Petition 12A]
  • February 08, 2021: [USPO PROB 12A - Report of Offender]
  • February 08, 2021: [Case Referred to Judge]
January, 2021
  • January 26, 2021: [Case Reassigned]
  • January 25, 2021: [SEALED Statement of Reasons]
  • January 25, 2021: [SEALED Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
  • January 25, 2021: [USPO PROB 12A - Report of Offender]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.