U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:21-cr-00022-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Ransome
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 16, 2022: [Response to Motion]
October, 2022
  • October 13, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 07, 2022: [Letter]
March, 2022
  • March 30, 2022: [Notice Regarding Passport]
February, 2022
  • February 16, 2022: [Judgment - Statement of Reasons]
  • February 16, 2022: [Judgment]
January, 2022
  • January 27, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 27, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • January 27, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 20, 2022: [Sealed Document]
  • January 20, 2022: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • January 20, 2022: [Seal Document]
  • January 20, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum or Response]
  • January 18, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum or Response]
July, 2021
  • July 08, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • July 08, 2021: [Summons Returned Executed]
May, 2021
  • May 19, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • May 05, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • May 03, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
April, 2021
  • April 30, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 26, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 26, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • April 13, 2021: [Objection to Presentence Investigation Report]
  • April 01, 2021: [Objection to Presentence Investigation Report]
March, 2021
  • March 19, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report]
February, 2021
  • February 01, 2021: [Notice Regarding Passport]
  • February 01, 2021: [Pretrial Report]
January, 2021
  • January 29, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • January 29, 2021: [Bond]
  • January 29, 2021: [Notice of PSI Interview Preference]
  • January 29, 2021: [Plea Hearing]
  • January 29, 2021: [Acceptance of Guilty Plea]
  • January 29, 2021: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • January 29, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • January 29, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • January 27, 2021: [Summons Issued]
  • January 26, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • January 26, 2021: [Factual Basis]
  • January 26, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
  • January 26, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • January 25, 2021: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.