U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cr-00030-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Autry
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 20, 2022: [SEALED Order]
  • October 20, 2022: [Order on Motion to Seal ]
  • October 20, 2022: [Seal ]
  • October 20, 2022: [PROPOSED SEALED Motion]
  • October 19, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
June, 2022
  • June 14, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 06, 2022: [SEALED Order]
  • June 03, 2022: [Order on Motion to Seal ]
  • June 03, 2022: [Seal ]
  • June 03, 2022: [PROPOSED SEALED Motion]
January, 2022
  • January 31, 2022: [Objection to PSI]
  • January 25, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • January 25, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • January 24, 2022: [Objection to PSI]
  • January 11, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report -Draft]
October, 2021
  • October 20, 2021: [Order Setting/Resetting Hearings]
  • October 20, 2021: [Forfeiture of Property ]
  • October 20, 2021: [Dismiss ]
  • October 20, 2021: [Plea Agreement ]
  • October 20, 2021: [Consent to Magistrate Arraignment]
  • October 20, 2021: [Arraignment ]
  • October 20, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
September, 2021
  • September 13, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • September 13, 2021: [Motion Submitted]
  • September 11, 2021: [Continue ]
July, 2021
  • July 20, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • July 20, 2021: [Continue ]
May, 2021
  • May 26, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • May 26, 2021: [Continue ]
  • May 13, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • May 13, 2021: [Extension of Time]
March, 2021
  • March 29, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • March 29, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • March 29, 2021: [Extension of Time]
  • March 29, 2021: [Continue ]
February, 2021
  • February 25, 2021: [Order - Written Order Following Oral Order on Motion]
  • February 25, 2021: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • February 25, 2021: [Detention Hearing ]
  • February 24, 2021: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • February 22, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • February 19, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • February 19, 2021: [Motion Referred]
  • February 18, 2021: [Continue ]
  • February 18, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • February 18, 2021: [Text Order]
  • February 17, 2021: [Scheduling Order ]
  • February 17, 2021: [Order of Detention - Temporary]
  • February 17, 2021: [Initial Appearance ]
  • February 17, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 17, 2021: [Oral Order]
  • February 17, 2021: [Order]
  • February 17, 2021: [Detention]
  • February 17, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • February 17, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • February 17, 2021: [Arrest ]
  • February 16, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
January, 2021
  • January 26, 2021: [Penalty Sheet]
  • January 26, 2021: [Warrant Requested]
  • January 26, 2021: [Warrant Issued ]
  • January 26, 2021: [Indictment ]
  • January 26, 2021: [Unredacted Document]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.