U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cr-00033-1
  • Case Name: USA v. McNair et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 20, 2023: [Restricted Sentencing Statement]
  • January 19, 2023: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • January 18, 2023: [Seal Document]
  • January 18, 2023: [PROPOSED SEALED Document]
  • January 06, 2023: [Order on Motion to Dismiss ]
  • January 06, 2023: [Plea Agreement Accepted ]
  • January 06, 2023: [Sentencing ]
  • January 05, 2023: [Statement Regarding Substantial Assistance]
December, 2022
  • December 27, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
September, 2022
  • September 29, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Sentencing]
  • September 28, 2022: [Continue Sentencing]
  • September 19, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
July, 2022
  • July 21, 2022: [Objection to PSI]
  • July 13, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • July 12, 2022: [Extension of Time]
June, 2022
  • June 28, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report -Draft]
  • June 02, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Sentencing]
  • June 02, 2022: [Continue Sentencing]
April, 2022
  • April 20, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
  • April 14, 2022: [Order Setting/Resetting Hearings]
  • April 14, 2022: [Dismiss ]
  • April 14, 2022: [Plea Agreement ]
  • April 14, 2022: [Consent to Magistrate Arraignment]
  • April 14, 2022: [Arraignment ]
  • April 14, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
March, 2022
  • March 29, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued ]
  • March 29, 2022: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • March 23, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued ]
  • March 23, 2022: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
February, 2022
  • February 23, 2022: [Objection to PSI]
  • February 08, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report -Draft]
January, 2022
  • January 30, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • January 28, 2022: [Continue ]
December, 2021
  • December 22, 2021: [Order Setting/Resetting Hearings]
  • December 16, 2021: [Dismiss ]
  • December 16, 2021: [Plea Agreement ]
  • December 16, 2021: [Consent to Magistrate Arraignment]
  • December 16, 2021: [Arraignment ]
  • December 16, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
November, 2021
  • November 22, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • November 22, 2021: [Continue ]
  • November 18, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
October, 2021
  • October 12, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • October 12, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • October 11, 2021: [Extension of Time]
  • October 11, 2021: [Continue ]
September, 2021
  • September 16, 2021: [Request for Discovery]
  • September 16, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • September 14, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • September 14, 2021: [Continue ]
  • September 14, 2021: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • September 14, 2021: [Motion Hearing ]
  • September 10, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • September 10, 2021: [Notice of Hearing on Motion ]
  • September 10, 2021: [Motion Referred]
  • September 09, 2021: [Continue ]
  • September 09, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
August, 2021
  • August 18, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued ]
  • August 18, 2021: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
July, 2021
  • July 21, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • July 20, 2021: [Continue ]
  • July 12, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • July 12, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • July 09, 2021: [Extension of Time]
  • July 09, 2021: [Continue ]
June, 2021
  • June 16, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued ]
  • June 16, 2021: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • June 09, 2021: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • June 08, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
May, 2021
  • May 25, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • May 25, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • May 24, 2021: [Extension of Time]
  • May 24, 2021: [Continue ]
April, 2021
  • April 26, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • April 26, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • April 23, 2021: [Extension of Time]
  • April 23, 2021: [Continue ]
  • April 08, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • April 08, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • April 08, 2021: [Extension of Time]
  • April 08, 2021: [Notice of Deficiency]
  • April 08, 2021: [Continue ]
March, 2021
  • March 21, 2021: [Request for Discovery]
  • March 21, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 21, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • March 19, 2021: [Scheduling Order ]
  • March 19, 2021: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • March 19, 2021: [Detention Hearing ]
  • March 19, 2021: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
  • March 19, 2021: [Text Order]
  • March 19, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release ]
  • March 19, 2021: [Initial Appearance ]
  • March 19, 2021: [Arrest ]
  • March 18, 2021: [Notice to Counsel]
  • March 17, 2021: [Request for Discovery]
  • March 17, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 17, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued ]
  • March 17, 2021: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • March 17, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 16, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • March 16, 2021: [Continue ]
  • March 15, 2021: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • March 15, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued ]
  • March 14, 2021: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • March 11, 2021: [Text Order]
  • March 11, 2021: [Scheduling Order ]
  • March 11, 2021: [Order of Detention - Temporary]
  • March 11, 2021: [Initial Appearance ]
  • March 11, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 11, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • March 11, 2021: [Order]
  • March 11, 2021: [Oral Order]
  • March 11, 2021: [Detention]
  • March 11, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • March 11, 2021: [Arrest ]
  • March 11, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • March 09, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued ]
  • March 09, 2021: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • March 08, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
January, 2021
  • January 26, 2021: [Warrant Issued ]
  • January 26, 2021: [Penalty Sheet]
  • January 26, 2021: [Indictment ]
  • January 26, 2021: [Unredacted Document]
  • January 26, 2021: [Warrant Requested]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.