U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cr-00031-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Starks
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 16, 2022: [Judgment ]
  • December 07, 2022: [Plea Agreement Accepted ]
  • December 07, 2022: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • December 07, 2022: [Sentencing ]
November, 2022
  • November 30, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Document ]
  • November 30, 2022: [Statement Regarding Substantial Assistance]
  • November 29, 2022: [Leave to File Document ]
  • November 28, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
  • November 18, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
October, 2022
  • October 13, 2022: [Objection to PSI]
September, 2022
  • September 29, 2022: [Objection to PSI]
  • September 28, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report -Draft]
August, 2022
  • August 04, 2022: [Order Setting/Resetting Hearings]
  • August 04, 2022: [Plea Agreement ]
  • August 04, 2022: [Consent to Magistrate Arraignment]
  • August 04, 2022: [Arraignment ]
  • August 04, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
July, 2022
  • July 27, 2022: [Forfeiture of Property ]
May, 2022
  • May 09, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • May 09, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • May 09, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • May 09, 2022: [Continue ]
April, 2022
  • April 04, 2022: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel - USA]
March, 2022
  • March 08, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • March 08, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • March 07, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • March 07, 2022: [Continue ]
January, 2022
  • January 07, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • January 07, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • January 06, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • January 06, 2022: [Continue ]
November, 2021
  • November 09, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • November 09, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • November 08, 2021: [Extension of Time]
  • November 08, 2021: [Continue ]
September, 2021
  • September 08, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • September 08, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • September 07, 2021: [Extension of Time]
  • September 07, 2021: [Continue ]
July, 2021
  • July 09, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • July 09, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • July 09, 2021: [Extension of Time]
  • July 09, 2021: [Continue ]
June, 2021
  • June 09, 2021: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • June 09, 2021: [Detention Hearing ]
  • June 09, 2021: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
  • June 09, 2021: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • June 07, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • June 07, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 04, 2021: [Scheduling Order ]
  • June 04, 2021: [Text Order]
  • June 04, 2021: [Initial Appearance ]
  • June 04, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 04, 2021: [Order of Detention - Temporary]
  • June 04, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • June 04, 2021: [Detention]
  • June 04, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • June 04, 2021: [Arrest ]
  • June 02, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
January, 2021
  • January 26, 2021: [Notice of Related Case]
  • January 26, 2021: [Warrant Requested]
  • January 26, 2021: [Warrant Issued ]
  • January 26, 2021: [Penalty Sheet]
  • January 26, 2021: [Indictment ]
  • January 26, 2021: [Unredacted Document]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.