U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00024-1
  • Case Name: USA v. ELLIS
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2021
  • June 15, 2021: [SEALED Statement of Reasons]
  • June 15, 2021: [Judgment]
  • June 07, 2021: [Sentencing]
May, 2021
  • May 28, 2021: [Sentencing Memorandum (Not Sealed)]
  • May 25, 2021: [SEALED Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
  • May 12, 2021: [SEALED Response to Draft PSR - NOTICE TO PROBATION AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
April, 2021
  • April 30, 2021: [SEALED Draft Presentence Investigation Report]
March, 2021
  • March 02, 2021: [Order]
  • March 02, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • March 02, 2021: [Case Reassigned]
February, 2021
  • February 25, 2021: [Factual Basis Document]
  • February 23, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
  • February 16, 2021: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • February 15, 2021: [Motion Submitted]
  • February 11, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • February 10, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • February 04, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • February 04, 2021: [Appearance Bond]
  • February 04, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • February 04, 2021: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • February 04, 2021: [Arraignment and Detention Hearing]
  • February 02, 2021: [SEALED Pretrial Service Report]
  • February 01, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
January, 2021
  • January 28, 2021: [Order Scheduling Detention Hearing]
  • January 28, 2021: [Order Appointing Panel Attorney]
  • January 28, 2021: [CJA 23 - Financial Affidavit-SEALED]
  • January 28, 2021: [Oral Motion]
  • January 28, 2021: [Initial Appearance ]
  • January 28, 2021: [Arrest]
  • January 26, 2021: [Warrant Issued]
  • January 26, 2021: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.