U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00023-1
  • Case Name: USA v. BISHOP
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 16, 2022: [SEALED Statement of Reasons]
  • November 16, 2022: [Judgment]
October, 2022
  • October 05, 2022: [SEALED USPO Sentencing Memorandum]
September, 2022
  • September 19, 2022: [SEALED Position Paper Re Sentencing Factors - NOTICE TO THE COURT AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • September 01, 2022: [Notice of Rescheduling]
August, 2022
  • August 31, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum - SEALED]
  • August 12, 2022: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • August 12, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • August 11, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum - SEALED]
  • August 10, 2022: [SEALED Document]
June, 2022
  • June 17, 2022: [SEALED Position Paper Re Sentencing Factors - NOTICE TO THE COURT AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • June 14, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Substitution - Defendant]
May, 2022
  • May 16, 2022: [SEALED Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
April, 2022
  • April 29, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 25, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 14, 2022: [SEALED Response to Draft PSR - NOTICE TO PROBATION AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
March, 2022
  • March 29, 2022: [Order Continuing Sentencing]
  • March 28, 2022: [Motion Submitted]
  • March 25, 2022: [Continue ]
  • March 25, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Substitution - Defendant]
  • March 10, 2022: [SEALED Draft Presentence Investigation Report]
December, 2021
  • December 10, 2021: [Defendant Assigned/Reassigned]
  • December 10, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing]
November, 2021
  • November 30, 2021: [Status Report ]
  • November 16, 2021: [Factual Basis Document]
  • November 15, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
October, 2021
  • October 25, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 25, 2021: [Arraignment]
  • October 22, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • October 22, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • October 22, 2021: [Waiver of Presence at Arraignment]
  • October 21, 2021: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • October 21, 2021: [Waiver of Detention Hearing/Waiver of Preliminary Examination or Hearing]
  • October 21, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • October 21, 2021: [SEALED Pretrial Service Report]
  • October 18, 2021: [Order Scheduling Detention Hearing]
  • October 18, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • October 18, 2021: [CJA 23 - Financial Affidavit-SEALED]
  • October 18, 2021: [Oral Motion]
  • October 18, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • October 18, 2021: [Arrest]
January, 2021
  • January 26, 2021: [Warrant Issued]
  • January 26, 2021: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.