U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00019-1
  • Case Name: USA v. HOLLEY
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2021
  • August 26, 2021: [Case Reassigned]
  • August 26, 2021: [Criminal Order of Dismissal]
May, 2021
  • May 14, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
April, 2021
  • April 28, 2021: [Notice of Related Case]
  • April 27, 2021: [Status Report ]
  • April 14, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • April 09, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 09, 2021: [Arraignment and Detention Hearing]
  • April 05, 2021: [Notice of Rescheduling]
  • April 05, 2021: [SEALED Pretrial Service Report]
  • April 02, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
March, 2021
  • March 24, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • March 22, 2021: [CJA 23 - Financial Affidavit-SEALED]
  • March 22, 2021: [Rule 5 Documents Received]
  • March 22, 2021: [Arrest - Other District ]
January, 2021
  • January 26, 2021: [Warrant Issued]
  • January 26, 2021: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.