U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00020-1
  • Case Name: USA v. O'LEARY
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2022
  • March 03, 2022: [Judgment]
  • March 03, 2022: [SEALED Statement of Reasons]
February, 2022
  • February 02, 2022: [Sentencing]
January, 2022
  • January 25, 2022: [SEALED Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
  • January 13, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum - SEALED]
  • January 05, 2022: [SEALED Response to Draft PSR - NOTICE TO PROBATION AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • January 04, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • January 03, 2022: [Motion Submitted]
December, 2021
  • December 30, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Document ]
  • December 21, 2021: [SEALED Notice of Apparent Violation]
  • December 17, 2021: [SEALED Draft Presentence Investigation Report]
November, 2021
  • November 02, 2021: [Defendant Assigned/Reassigned]
  • November 02, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing]
October, 2021
  • October 27, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
  • October 27, 2021: [Status Report ]
September, 2021
  • September 14, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 09, 2021: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • September 09, 2021: [Oral Motion]
  • September 09, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • September 09, 2021: [Bond Hearing]
  • September 09, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • September 09, 2021: [Arraignment]
  • September 09, 2021: [Arrest]
February, 2021
  • February 10, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
January, 2021
  • January 26, 2021: [Warrant Issued]
  • January 26, 2021: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.