U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00031-1
  • Case Name: USA v. MAULTSBY
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2025
  • March 19, 2025: [SEALED Response to Statement of Position on Eligibility]
  • March 14, 2025: [SEALED Response to USPO Memorandum Re 2023 Criminal History Retroactive Amendment]
May, 2022
  • May 09, 2022: [Appeal Transcript]
April, 2022
  • April 11, 2022: [Order]
  • April 07, 2022: [Order]
  • April 07, 2022: [USCA Notice of Docketing Record on Appeal]
  • April 05, 2022: [Electronic Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA]
  • April 05, 2022: [Notice of Appeal Without Fee Payment]
  • April 04, 2022: [SEALED Statement of Reasons]
  • April 04, 2022: [Judgment]
March, 2022
  • March 18, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • March 03, 2022: [Notice of Rescheduling]
February, 2022
  • February 25, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw Plea of Guilty]
  • February 25, 2022: [SEALED Order on SEALED Motion]
  • February 25, 2022: [Motion Hearing]
  • February 25, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 24, 2022: [SEALED Motion]
  • February 22, 2022: [SEALED Position Paper Re Sentencing Factors - NOTICE TO THE COURT AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • February 18, 2022: [SEALED Position Paper Re Sentencing Factors - NOTICE TO THE COURT AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • February 09, 2022: [Notice of Rescheduling]
January, 2022
  • January 05, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • January 04, 2022: [Transcript]
December, 2021
  • December 29, 2021: [Transcript]
  • December 22, 2021: [Order]
  • December 16, 2021: [Withdraw Plea of Guilty]
November, 2021
  • November 15, 2021: [Order Continuing Sentencing]
  • November 12, 2021: [SEALED Motion]
October, 2021
  • October 20, 2021: [SEALED Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
  • October 04, 2021: [SEALED Position Paper Re Sentencing Factors - NOTICE TO THE COURT AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
September, 2021
  • September 27, 2021: [SEALED Response to Draft PSR - NOTICE TO PROBATION AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • September 24, 2021: [SEALED Response to Draft PSR - NOTICE TO PROBATION AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • September 13, 2021: [SEALED Draft Presentence Investigation Report]
July, 2021
  • July 16, 2021: [Order]
  • July 08, 2021: [Defendant Assigned/Reassigned]
  • July 08, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • July 07, 2021: [Order on Motion to Suppress ]
  • July 07, 2021: [Exhibit List ]
  • July 06, 2021: [Motion Hearing ]
  • July 01, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
  • July 01, 2021: [Factual Basis Document]
  • July 01, 2021: [Status Report ]
June, 2021
  • June 08, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial]
  • June 04, 2021: [Continue Trial]
  • June 04, 2021: [Response to Motion]
  • June 03, 2021: [SEALED Brief]
May, 2021
  • May 27, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • May 27, 2021: [Motion Submitted]
  • May 26, 2021: [Status Report ]
  • May 26, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Document ]
  • May 11, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • May 06, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 06, 2021: [Arraignment ]
  • May 04, 2021: [Docket Call]
April, 2021
  • April 30, 2021: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 27, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 27, 2021: [Superseding Indictment]
  • April 26, 2021: [Response to Motion]
  • April 19, 2021: [Suppress]
  • April 19, 2021: [Memorandum]
  • April 09, 2021: [Notice of Related Case]
  • April 08, 2021: [Order on Oral Motion]
March, 2021
  • March 15, 2021: [Order]
  • March 12, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 12, 2021: [Arraignment and Detention Hearing]
  • March 10, 2021: [SEALED Pretrial Service Report]
  • March 08, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • March 05, 2021: [Order Scheduling Detention Hearing]
  • March 05, 2021: [Order Appointing Panel Attorney]
  • March 05, 2021: [CJA 23 - Financial Affidavit-SEALED]
  • March 05, 2021: [Oral Motion]
  • March 05, 2021: [Initial Appearance ]
  • March 05, 2021: [Arrest]
January, 2021
  • January 27, 2021: [Warrant Issued]
  • January 26, 2021: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.