U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00042-1
  • Case Name: USA v. PLATT
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2022
  • June 10, 2022: [SEALED Statement of Reasons]
  • June 10, 2022: [Judgment]
  • June 02, 2022: [Sentencing]
May, 2022
  • May 20, 2022: [SEALED Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
  • May 12, 2022: [SEALED Response to Draft PSR - NOTICE TO PROBATION AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • May 10, 2022: [SEALED Response to Draft PSR - NOTICE TO PROBATION AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
April, 2022
  • April 27, 2022: [SEALED Draft Presentence Investigation Report]
March, 2022
  • March 14, 2022: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • March 14, 2022: [Notice-Other]
  • March 11, 2022: [Order]
  • March 11, 2022: [Case Reassigned]
  • March 11, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • March 01, 2022: [Factual Basis Document]
  • March 01, 2022: [Status Report ]
  • March 01, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
January, 2022
  • January 24, 2022: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • January 24, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 24, 2022: [Arraignment and Detention Hearing]
  • January 13, 2022: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • January 13, 2022: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • January 13, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • January 13, 2022: [Oral Motion]
  • January 13, 2022: [Arraignment and Detention Hearing]
  • January 12, 2022: [SEALED Pretrial Service Report]
  • January 06, 2022: [Order Scheduling Detention Hearing]
  • January 06, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • January 06, 2022: [CJA 23 - Financial Affidavit-SEALED]
  • January 06, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • January 06, 2022: [Detention]
  • January 06, 2022: [Arrest]
January, 2021
  • January 27, 2021: [Warrant Issued]
  • January 27, 2021: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.