U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00041-1
  • Case Name: USA v. BROWN
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2022
  • June 10, 2022: [PETITION and ORDER for Action on Supervised Release]
April, 2022
  • April 05, 2022: [PETITION and ORDER for Action on Supervised Release]
March, 2022
  • March 31, 2022: [SEALED Statement of Reasons]
  • March 31, 2022: [Judgment]
February, 2022
  • February 23, 2022: [Transfer In/Supervised Release]
  • February 16, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • February 08, 2022: [SEALED Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
January, 2022
  • January 29, 2022: [SEALED Response to Draft PSR - NOTICE TO PROBATION AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • January 26, 2022: [SEALED Response to Draft PSR - NOTICE TO PROBATION AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • January 14, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • January 12, 2022: [SEALED Draft Presentence Investigation Report]
November, 2021
  • November 03, 2021: [Defendant Assigned/Reassigned]
  • November 03, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing]
October, 2021
  • October 27, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
  • October 26, 2021: [Notice-Other]
  • October 26, 2021: [Factual Basis Document]
  • October 04, 2021: [Order on Oral Motion]
September, 2021
  • September 16, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 16, 2021: [Arraignment and Detention Hearing]
  • September 14, 2021: [SEALED Pretrial Service Report]
  • September 09, 2021: [Order Scheduling Detention Hearing]
  • September 09, 2021: [Order Appointing Panel Attorney]
  • September 09, 2021: [CJA 23 - Financial Affidavit-SEALED]
  • September 09, 2021: [Oral Motion]
  • September 09, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • September 09, 2021: [Arrest]
January, 2021
  • January 27, 2021: [Warrant Issued]
  • January 27, 2021: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.