U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00037-1
  • Case Name: USA v. PASLEY
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2022
  • June 03, 2022: [SEALED Order]
  • June 01, 2022: [Motion Submitted]
May, 2022
  • May 09, 2022: [SEALED Motion]
November, 2021
  • November 12, 2021: [SEALED Statement of Reasons]
  • November 12, 2021: [Judgment]
October, 2021
  • October 29, 2021: [Sentencing]
  • October 25, 2021: [SEALED Document]
  • October 22, 2021: [Sentencing Memorandum - SEALED]
  • October 21, 2021: [SEALED Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
  • October 20, 2021: [Sentencing Memorandum - SEALED]
September, 2021
  • September 10, 2021: [SEALED Response to Draft PSR - NOTICE TO PROBATION AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • September 03, 2021: [SEALED Response to Draft PSR - NOTICE TO PROBATION AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
August, 2021
  • August 20, 2021: [SEALED Draft Presentence Investigation Report]
May, 2021
  • May 18, 2021: [Notice of Rescheduling]
  • May 05, 2021: [Order]
  • May 05, 2021: [Case Reassigned]
  • May 05, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • May 03, 2021: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • May 03, 2021: [Factual Basis Document]
April, 2021
  • April 30, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
  • April 28, 2021: [Status Report ]
March, 2021
  • March 26, 2021: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • March 26, 2021: [Oral Motion]
  • March 17, 2021: [Waiver of Presence at Arraignment]
  • March 17, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 17, 2021: [Arraignment ]
  • March 15, 2021: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 01, 2021: [Waiver of Presence at Arraignment]
February, 2021
  • February 05, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • February 02, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • February 02, 2021: [Appearance Bond]
  • February 02, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • February 02, 2021: [CJA 23 - Financial Affidavit-SEALED]
  • February 02, 2021: [Initial Appearance ]
  • February 02, 2021: [Bond Hearing]
  • February 02, 2021: [Arrest]
January, 2021
  • January 27, 2021: [Warrant Issued]
  • January 27, 2021: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.