U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00034-1
  • Case Name: USA v. SATTERWHITE
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 18, 2022: [Criminal Order of Dismissal]
  • November 17, 2022: [Order]
  • November 17, 2022: [Criminal Order of Dismissal]
  • November 17, 2022: [Case Reassigned]
  • November 08, 2022: [Exam Report SEALED]
August, 2022
  • August 08, 2022: [SEALED Motion]
June, 2022
  • June 06, 2022: [Order on Oral Motion]
May, 2022
  • May 24, 2022: [SEALED Order on SEALED Motion]
  • May 23, 2022: [Motion Submitted]
  • May 23, 2022: [SEALED Motion]
  • May 10, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 10, 2022: [Arraignment and Detention Hearing]
  • May 09, 2022: [SEALED Pretrial Service Report]
  • May 05, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • May 03, 2022: [Order Scheduling Detention Hearing]
  • May 03, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • May 03, 2022: [CJA 23 - Financial Affidavit-SEALED]
  • May 03, 2022: [Oral Motion]
  • May 03, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • May 03, 2022: [Arrest]
January, 2021
  • January 27, 2021: [Warrant Issued]
  • January 27, 2021: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.