U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00032-1
  • Case Name: USA v. MASSEY
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2024
  • October 08, 2024: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • October 08, 2024: [Order]
December, 2021
  • December 20, 2021: [Appeal Transcript]
October, 2021
  • October 31, 2021: [Transcript Request - Appeal]
  • October 19, 2021: [USCA Receipt of ROA]
  • October 19, 2021: [Electronic Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA]
  • October 18, 2021: [SEALED Statement of Reasons]
  • October 18, 2021: [Judgment]
  • October 13, 2021: [Transcript Request - Appeal]
  • October 13, 2021: [Notice of Appeal]
September, 2021
  • September 30, 2021: [Sentencing]
  • September 27, 2021: [Notice of Rescheduling]
August, 2021
  • August 31, 2021: [Notice of Rescheduling]
  • August 27, 2021: [SEALED Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
July, 2021
  • July 26, 2021: [SEALED Position Paper Re Sentencing Factors - NOTICE TO THE COURT AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • July 26, 2021: [SEALED Order on SEALED Motion]
  • July 23, 2021: [SEALED Motion]
  • July 23, 2021: [SEALED Position Paper Re Sentencing Factors - NOTICE TO THE COURT AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • July 08, 2021: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • July 08, 2021: [Order]
  • July 06, 2021: [Order Continuing Sentencing]
  • July 02, 2021: [SEALED Motion]
June, 2021
  • June 30, 2021: [SEALED Response to Draft PSR - NOTICE TO PROBATION AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • June 16, 2021: [SEALED Draft Presentence Investigation Report]
May, 2021
  • May 03, 2021: [Order]
  • May 03, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • May 03, 2021: [Case Reassigned]
April, 2021
  • April 28, 2021: [Factual Basis Document]
  • April 28, 2021: [Status Report ]
  • April 27, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
  • April 07, 2021: [Notice-Other]
  • April 01, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue]
March, 2021
  • March 31, 2021: [Status Report ]
  • March 29, 2021: [Motion Submitted]
  • March 28, 2021: [Continue ]
  • March 22, 2021: [Discovery]
  • March 03, 2021: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • March 02, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 02, 2021: [Arraignment and Detention Hearing]
  • March 01, 2021: [SEALED Pretrial Service Report]
February, 2021
  • February 24, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • February 23, 2021: [Order Scheduling Detention Hearing]
  • February 23, 2021: [Oral Motion]
  • February 23, 2021: [Initial Appearance ]
  • February 23, 2021: [Arrest]
  • February 23, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
January, 2021
  • January 27, 2021: [Warrant Issued]
  • January 27, 2021: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.