U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 7:21-cr-00012-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Schenck
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 05, 2022: [Continue ]
  • December 05, 2022: [Order on Motion to Seal ]
November, 2022
  • November 18, 2022: [Seal ]
  • November 18, 2022: [PROPOSED SEALED Motion]
October, 2022
  • October 06, 2022: [Order on Motion to Seal ]
  • October 06, 2022: [Seal ]
September, 2022
  • September 06, 2022: [Continue Sentencing]
  • September 01, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
July, 2022
  • July 13, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Sentencing]
  • July 13, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • July 13, 2022: [Continue Sentencing]
  • July 13, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • July 01, 2022: [Objection to PSI]
June, 2022
  • June 17, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report -Draft]
May, 2022
  • May 03, 2022: [Order Setting/Resetting Hearings]
March, 2022
  • March 08, 2022: [Order for Forfeiture of Property]
  • March 08, 2022: [Plea Agreement ]
  • March 08, 2022: [Arraignment ]
  • March 08, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • March 08, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
December, 2021
  • December 07, 2021: [Continue ]
  • December 07, 2021: [Docket Call]
October, 2021
  • October 12, 2021: [Continue ]
  • October 08, 2021: [Release Status Report]
September, 2021
  • September 14, 2021: [Continue ]
July, 2021
  • July 01, 2021: [Continue ]
June, 2021
  • June 30, 2021: [Release Status Report]
May, 2021
  • May 26, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • May 26, 2021: [Continue ]
April, 2021
  • April 28, 2021: [Release Status Report]
  • April 28, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • April 28, 2021: [Continue ]
  • April 26, 2021: [PETITION and ORDER for Action on Pretrial Release]
  • April 21, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
March, 2021
  • March 23, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release ]
  • March 23, 2021: [Motion Hearing ]
  • March 22, 2021: [Order on Motion to Seal ]
  • March 19, 2021: [Notice of Hearing on Motion ]
  • March 15, 2021: [Seal ]
  • March 15, 2021: [PROPOSED SEALED Response]
  • March 15, 2021: [Motions No Longer Referred]
  • March 12, 2021: [Motion Referred]
  • March 12, 2021: [Order on Motion for Protective Order ]
  • March 12, 2021: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • March 11, 2021: [Motion Submitted]
  • March 11, 2021: [Protective Order ]
  • March 09, 2021: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • March 09, 2021: [Detention Hearing ]
  • March 09, 2021: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • March 04, 2021: [Scheduling Order ]
  • March 02, 2021: [Order of Detention - Temporary]
  • March 02, 2021: [Initial Appearance ]
  • March 02, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 02, 2021: [Text Order]
  • March 02, 2021: [Oral Order]
  • March 02, 2021: [Arrest ]
  • March 02, 2021: [Detention]
  • March 01, 2021: [Request for Discovery]
  • March 01, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 01, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
February, 2021
  • February 26, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
January, 2021
  • January 28, 2021: [Warrant Requested]
  • January 28, 2021: [Warrant Issued ]
  • January 28, 2021: [Penalty Sheet]
  • January 28, 2021: [Indictment ]
  • January 28, 2021: [Unredacted Document]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.