U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00051-1
  • Case Name: USA v. HILES
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2022
  • June 06, 2022: [Order On Probation Petition 12A]
  • June 03, 2022: [Case Referred to Judge]
  • June 02, 2022: [USPO PROB 12A - Report of Offender]
October, 2021
  • October 20, 2021: [SEALED Statement of Reasons]
  • October 20, 2021: [Judgment]
September, 2021
  • September 14, 2021: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing - Sentencing]
July, 2021
  • July 09, 2021: [Notice of Rescheduling]
June, 2021
  • June 28, 2021: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • June 28, 2021: [Sentencing]
  • June 24, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • June 23, 2021: [Motion Submitted]
  • June 23, 2021: [Continue ]
  • June 21, 2021: [SEALED Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
  • June 16, 2021: [SEALED Response to Draft PSR - NOTICE TO PROBATION AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
May, 2021
  • May 24, 2021: [SEALED Response to Draft PSR - NOTICE TO PROBATION AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • May 24, 2021: [SEALED Draft Presentence Investigation Report]
February, 2021
  • February 04, 2021: [Arraignment ]
  • February 04, 2021: [Plea Agreement Hearing]
  • February 04, 2021: [Initial Appearance ]
  • February 04, 2021: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • February 04, 2021: [Case Reassigned]
  • February 04, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • February 04, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • February 02, 2021: [Summons Issued]
  • February 02, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
  • February 01, 2021: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.