U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00002-1
  • Case Name: USA v. McGilvery
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 19, 2023: [Letter]
April, 2021
  • April 02, 2021: [Judgment - Revocation Proceedings]
  • April 01, 2021: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
March, 2021
  • March 11, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
February, 2021
  • February 17, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • February 17, 2021: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
  • February 17, 2021: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • February 17, 2021: [Preliminary and Detention Hearing]
  • February 16, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • February 12, 2021: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • February 12, 2021: [Oral Order Appointing Counsel]
  • February 12, 2021: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • February 12, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • February 10, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • February 10, 2021: [Arrest]
  • February 01, 2021: [Transfer In/Probationer]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.