U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:20-cr-00466-1
  • Case Name: USA v. JONES
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
February, 2022
  • February 25, 2022: [Transcript]
July, 2021
  • July 15, 2021: [SEALED Statement of Reasons]
  • July 15, 2021: [Judgment]
  • July 13, 2021: [Sentencing]
June, 2021
  • June 29, 2021: [SEALED Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
  • June 21, 2021: [SEALED Position Paper Re Sentencing Factors - NOTICE TO THE COURT AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
May, 2021
  • May 25, 2021: [SEALED Response to Draft PSR - NOTICE TO PROBATION AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • May 20, 2021: [SEALED Response to Draft PSR - NOTICE TO PROBATION AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • May 11, 2021: [SEALED Draft Presentence Investigation Report]
April, 2021
  • April 06, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
  • April 06, 2021: [Case Reassigned]
  • April 06, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing]
March, 2021
  • March 30, 2021: [Factual Basis Document]
  • March 29, 2021: [Status Report ]
  • March 29, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
February, 2021
  • February 12, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • February 11, 2021: [Motion Submitted]
  • February 11, 2021: [Continue ]
  • February 09, 2021: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • February 09, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • February 09, 2021: [Arraignment and Detention Hearing]
  • February 08, 2021: [SEALED Pretrial Service Report]
  • February 05, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • February 02, 2021: [Order Scheduling Detention Hearing]
  • February 02, 2021: [Order Appointing Panel Attorney]
  • February 02, 2021: [CJA 23 - Financial Affidavit-SEALED]
  • February 02, 2021: [Initial Appearance ]
  • February 02, 2021: [Arrest]
  • February 01, 2021: [Detention]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.