U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:21-cr-00009-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Farr
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2021
  • August 30, 2021: [Order on Motion to Seal ]
  • August 30, 2021: [Order on PROPOSED SEALED Motion]
  • August 30, 2021: [Seal ]
  • August 30, 2021: [PROPOSED SEALED Motion]
  • August 06, 2021: [Judgment ]
  • August 05, 2021: [Order to Surrender]
  • August 05, 2021: [Sentencing ]
July, 2021
  • July 28, 2021: [Order on Motion to Seal ]
  • July 27, 2021: [Sentencing Memorandum (NOT SEALED)]
  • July 27, 2021: [Motion Submitted]
  • July 27, 2021: [Seal ]
  • July 27, 2021: [PROPOSED SEALED Document]
  • July 20, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
June, 2021
  • June 01, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Sentencing]
  • June 01, 2021: [Continue Sentencing]
April, 2021
  • April 27, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report -Draft]
March, 2021
  • March 19, 2021: [Order for Forfeiture of Property]
  • March 19, 2021: [Document]
  • March 19, 2021: [Plea Agreement ]
  • March 19, 2021: [Waiver of Indictment ]
  • March 19, 2021: [Arraignment ]
  • March 19, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 19, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
February, 2021
  • February 26, 2021: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • February 24, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • February 02, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 02, 2021: [Request for Discovery]
  • February 02, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • February 02, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • February 02, 2021: [Notice to Counsel]
  • February 02, 2021: [Information - Felony]
  • February 02, 2021: [Penalty Sheet]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.