U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cr-00050-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Garfield
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
July, 2021
  • July 26, 2021: [Judgment ]
  • July 19, 2021: [Order to Surrender]
  • July 19, 2021: [Sentencing ]
June, 2021
  • June 25, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • June 17, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Sentencing]
  • June 17, 2021: [Continue Sentencing]
  • June 16, 2021: [Order on Motion to Seal ]
  • June 15, 2021: [Motion Submitted]
  • June 14, 2021: [Seal ]
  • June 14, 2021: [PROPOSED SEALED Document]
  • June 02, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
May, 2021
  • May 24, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • May 19, 2021: [Objection to PSI]
  • May 05, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report -Draft]
March, 2021
  • March 30, 2021: [Plea Agreement ]
  • March 24, 2021: [Consent to Magistrate Arraignment]
  • March 24, 2021: [Arraignment ]
  • March 24, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 24, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • March 24, 2021: [Waiver of Indictment ]
  • March 08, 2021: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • March 03, 2021: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • March 03, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
February, 2021
  • February 09, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 02, 2021: [Request for Discovery]
  • February 02, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • February 02, 2021: [Notice to Counsel]
  • February 02, 2021: [Information - Felony]
  • February 02, 2021: [Penalty Sheet]
  • February 02, 2021: [Notice of Related Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.