U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cr-00006-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Ledford
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2021
  • August 16, 2021: [Judgment Returned Executed]
June, 2021
  • June 02, 2021: [Judgment - Statement of Reasons]
  • June 02, 2021: [Judgment]
  • June 02, 2021: [Sentencing]
April, 2021
  • April 22, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report]
March, 2021
  • March 30, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • March 01, 2021: [Pretrial Report]
February, 2021
  • February 16, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • February 16, 2021: [Acceptance of Guilty Plea]
  • February 16, 2021: [Notice of PSI Interview Preference]
  • February 16, 2021: [Plea Hearing]
  • February 16, 2021: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • February 16, 2021: [Oral Order Appointing Counsel]
  • February 16, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • February 11, 2021: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • February 09, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • February 09, 2021: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • February 09, 2021: [Appoint Counsel]
  • February 08, 2021: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • February 04, 2021: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • February 03, 2021: [Factual Basis]
  • February 02, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
  • February 02, 2021: [Information Pursuant to Title 21]
  • February 02, 2021: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.