U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00054-1
  • Case Name: USA v. PHIFER
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [SEALED Order re PROB 12A - Report of Offender]
  • March 26, 2025: [SEALED USPO PROB 12A - Report of Offender]
March, 2022
  • March 08, 2022: [Transcript]
September, 2021
  • September 09, 2021: [SEALED Statement of Reasons]
  • September 09, 2021: [Judgment]
July, 2021
  • July 26, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • July 26, 2021: [Sentencing Memorandum - SEALED]
  • July 23, 2021: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • July 23, 2021: [Sentencing]
  • July 21, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • July 20, 2021: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum ]
  • July 20, 2021: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • July 20, 2021: [Motion Submitted]
  • July 20, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
June, 2021
  • June 15, 2021: [SEALED Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
  • June 15, 2021: [SEALED Response to Draft PSR - NOTICE TO PROBATION AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • June 09, 2021: [SEALED Response to Draft PSR - NOTICE TO PROBATION AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
May, 2021
  • May 27, 2021: [SEALED Draft Presentence Investigation Report]
February, 2021
  • February 04, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • February 03, 2021: [Arraignment ]
  • February 03, 2021: [Plea Agreement Hearing]
  • February 03, 2021: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • February 03, 2021: [CJA 23 - Financial Affidavit-SEALED]
  • February 03, 2021: [Case Reassigned]
  • February 03, 2021: [Notice of Related Case]
  • February 03, 2021: [Factual Basis Document]
  • February 03, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
  • February 03, 2021: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.