U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00055-1
  • Case Name: USA v. GATTIS
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2022
  • April 19, 2022: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
March, 2022
  • March 03, 2022: [Transcript]
February, 2022
  • February 17, 2022: [SEALED Statement of Reasons]
  • February 17, 2022: [Judgment]
  • February 03, 2022: [SEALED Order on SEALED Motion]
  • February 03, 2022: [Sentencing]
January, 2022
  • January 27, 2022: [SEALED Motion]
August, 2021
  • August 05, 2021: [Order Continuing Sentencing]
  • August 05, 2021: [SEALED Motion]
July, 2021
  • July 29, 2021: [SEALED Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
  • July 27, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • July 27, 2021: [Motion Submitted]
  • July 27, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • July 21, 2021: [SEALED Response to Draft PSR - NOTICE TO PROBATION AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • July 12, 2021: [SEALED Presentence Investigation Report - Revised]
June, 2021
  • June 25, 2021: [SEALED Draft Presentence Investigation Report]
May, 2021
  • May 03, 2021: [Order]
  • May 03, 2021: [Case Reassigned]
  • May 03, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing]
April, 2021
  • April 29, 2021: [Factual Basis Document]
  • April 28, 2021: [Status Report ]
  • April 21, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
March, 2021
  • March 05, 2021: [Order Appointing Panel Attorney]
  • March 04, 2021: [Notice of Related Case]
  • March 04, 2021: [Docket Call]
  • March 02, 2021: [Factual Basis Document]
February, 2021
  • February 04, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • February 04, 2021: [CJA 23 - Financial Affidavit-SEALED]
  • February 03, 2021: [Rule 20 - Transfer In ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.