U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:19-cr-00611-1
  • Case Name: USA vs. NULL
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2021
  • May 27, 2021: [Judgment on Revocation of Prob/SR]
  • May 14, 2021: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing - Sentencing]
  • May 14, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
April, 2021
  • April 28, 2021: [Notice of Rescheduling]
  • April 01, 2021: [Notice of Rescheduling]
March, 2021
  • March 09, 2021: [Sentencing Memorandum - SEALED]
  • March 04, 2021: [Sentencing Memorandum (Not Sealed)]
February, 2021
  • February 24, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • February 22, 2021: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • February 22, 2021: [Oral Motion]
  • February 19, 2021: [Preliminary Revocation and Detention Hearing]
  • February 18, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • February 16, 2021: [Probation Petition Amended 12C/Order]
  • February 15, 2021: [Case Referred to Judge]
  • February 12, 2021: [SEALED USPO PROB 12C - Supplement Report]
  • February 12, 2021: [SEALED USPO Amended Petition]
  • February 12, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • February 09, 2021: [Order Appointing Panel Attorney]
  • February 05, 2021: [CJA 23 - Financial Affidavit-SEALED]
  • February 05, 2021: [Rule 32.1 Documents Received]
  • February 05, 2021: [Arrest - Other District ]
  • February 03, 2021: [Case Reassigned]
  • February 03, 2021: [SEALED USPO PROB 12C - Offender Under Supervision]
  • February 03, 2021: [SEALED USPO PROB 12C - Supplement Report]
  • February 03, 2021: [SEALED Statement of Reasons]
  • February 03, 2021: [SEALED Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.