U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cr-00052-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Thomas
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 23, 2025: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney as to 23-SO-6]
  • May 23, 2025: [Withdraw as Attorney Regarding 23-SO-6]
  • May 23, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance Pursuant to 23-SO-6]
January, 2023
  • January 11, 2023: [USCA Order]
  • January 11, 2023: [USCA Case Number ]
  • January 10, 2023: [Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA]
  • January 09, 2023: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • January 05, 2023: [Amended Judgment]
  • January 04, 2023: [Judgment ]
December, 2022
  • December 08, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw Plea of Guilty]
  • December 08, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss ]
  • December 08, 2022: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • December 08, 2022: [Sentencing ]
  • December 02, 2022: [Forfeiture of Property ]
  • December 02, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • December 01, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum (NOT SEALED)]
November, 2022
  • November 17, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
September, 2022
  • September 09, 2022: [Objection to PSI]
August, 2022
  • August 26, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report -Draft]
July, 2022
  • July 06, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
June, 2022
  • June 29, 2022: [Order Setting/Resetting Hearings]
  • June 28, 2022: [Dismiss ]
  • June 28, 2022: [Consent to Magistrate Arraignment]
  • June 28, 2022: [Plea Agreement ]
  • June 28, 2022: [Withdraw Plea of Guilty]
  • June 28, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing ]
  • June 28, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
April, 2022
  • April 26, 2022: [Notice to Counsel]
  • April 26, 2022: [Scheduling Order ]
  • April 20, 2022: [Pretrial Conference ]
  • April 12, 2022: [Notice-other]
  • April 04, 2022: [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
  • April 04, 2022: [Transcript]
March, 2022
  • March 30, 2022: [Judgment ]
  • March 29, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 25, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • March 25, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • March 25, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • March 25, 2022: [Sentencing ]
  • March 25, 2022: [Remark]
  • March 24, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • March 24, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • March 24, 2022: [Motion Submitted]
  • March 15, 2022: [In Limine ]
  • March 02, 2022: [Order Setting/Resetting Hearings]
February, 2022
  • February 28, 2022: [Scheduling Conference ]
  • February 25, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • February 24, 2022: [Consent to Magistrate Arraignment]
  • February 24, 2022: [Arraignment ]
  • February 24, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • February 08, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
  • February 07, 2022: [Docket Call]
  • February 07, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 03, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Sentencing]
  • February 03, 2022: [Continue Sentencing]
January, 2022
  • January 19, 2022: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • January 18, 2022: [Forfeiture of Property ]
  • January 18, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • January 11, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report -Draft]
December, 2021
  • December 03, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • December 03, 2021: [Continue ]
  • December 03, 2021: [Notice of Deficiency]
  • December 02, 2021: [Continue ]
November, 2021
  • November 18, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • November 16, 2021: [Plea Agreement ]
  • November 16, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • November 16, 2021: [Arraignment ]
  • November 16, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 04, 2021: [Release Status Report]
October, 2021
  • October 12, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • October 12, 2021: [Continue ]
  • October 12, 2021: [Docket Call]
  • October 12, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
September, 2021
  • September 29, 2021: [Notice Regarding US Passport]
  • September 29, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • September 29, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • September 28, 2021: [Continue ]
  • September 28, 2021: [Extension of Time]
  • September 27, 2021: [Release Status Report]
August, 2021
  • August 09, 2021: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • August 09, 2021: [Detention Hearing ]
  • August 06, 2021: [Request for Discovery]
  • August 06, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 05, 2021: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • August 04, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • August 03, 2021: [Scheduling Order ]
  • August 03, 2021: [Oral Order]
  • August 03, 2021: [Text Order]
  • August 03, 2021: [Order of Detention - Temporary]
  • August 03, 2021: [Initial Appearance ]
  • August 03, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 03, 2021: [Detention]
  • August 02, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 02, 2021: [Arrest ]
July, 2021
  • July 28, 2021: [Penalty Sheet]
  • July 28, 2021: [Unredacted Document]
  • July 28, 2021: [Warrant Requested]
  • July 28, 2021: [Warrant Issued ]
  • July 28, 2021: [Indictment ]
  • July 27, 2021: [Continue ]
  • July 27, 2021: [Extension of Time]
May, 2021
  • May 25, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • May 24, 2021: [Continue ]
  • May 24, 2021: [Extension of Time]
April, 2021
  • April 01, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • April 01, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • April 01, 2021: [Motion Submitted]
March, 2021
  • March 31, 2021: [Continue ]
  • March 31, 2021: [Extension of Time]
  • March 22, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
February, 2021
  • February 22, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release ]
  • February 22, 2021: [Unredacted Document]
  • February 22, 2021: [Detention Hearing ]
  • February 16, 2021: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • February 12, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • February 12, 2021: [Motion Referred]
  • February 12, 2021: [Continue ]
  • February 12, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • February 11, 2021: [Request for Discovery]
  • February 11, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • February 11, 2021: [Certificate of Service ]
  • February 10, 2021: [Scheduling Order ]
  • February 10, 2021: [Order of Detention - Temporary]
  • February 10, 2021: [Initial Appearance ]
  • February 10, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 10, 2021: [Order - Written Order Following Oral Order on Motion]
  • February 10, 2021: [Detention]
  • February 10, 2021: [Oral Order]
  • February 10, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • February 10, 2021: [Arrest ]
  • February 09, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 04, 2021: [Warrant Requested]
  • February 04, 2021: [Warrant Issued ]
  • February 04, 2021: [Penalty Sheet]
  • February 04, 2021: [Indictment ]
  • February 04, 2021: [Unredacted Document]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.