U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 7:21-cr-00019-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Stokley
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2022
  • January 18, 2022: [Letter]
July, 2021
  • July 26, 2021: [Judgment ]
  • July 19, 2021: [Sentencing ]
  • July 15, 2021: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • July 12, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
  • July 08, 2021: [Forfeiture of Property ]
  • July 08, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • July 06, 2021: [Objection to PSI]
June, 2021
  • June 25, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • June 14, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report -Draft]
April, 2021
  • April 30, 2021: [Consent to Magistrate Arraignment]
  • April 30, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • April 30, 2021: [Arraignment ]
  • April 30, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 16, 2021: [Notice-other]
  • April 08, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
March, 2021
  • March 05, 2021: [Order - Written Order Following Oral Order on Motion]
  • March 05, 2021: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • March 05, 2021: [Detention Hearing ]
  • March 05, 2021: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • March 04, 2021: [Motion Submitted]
  • March 04, 2021: [Seal Document]
  • March 04, 2021: [PROPOSED SEALED Document]
February, 2021
  • February 24, 2021: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • February 24, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • February 23, 2021: [Motion Referred]
  • February 23, 2021: [Scheduling Order ]
  • February 23, 2021: [Continue ]
  • February 23, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • February 22, 2021: [Order of Detention - Temporary]
  • February 22, 2021: [Initial Appearance ]
  • February 22, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 22, 2021: [Text Order]
  • February 22, 2021: [Oral Order]
  • February 22, 2021: [Detention]
  • February 22, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • February 22, 2021: [Arrest ]
  • February 22, 2021: [Amended Penalty Sheet]
  • February 20, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • February 18, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 04, 2021: [Unredacted Document]
  • February 04, 2021: [Warrant Requested]
  • February 04, 2021: [Warrant Issued ]
  • February 04, 2021: [Penalty Sheet]
  • February 04, 2021: [Indictment ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.