U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 7:21-cr-00018-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Manning
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2021
  • November 12, 2021: [Amended Judgment]
  • November 10, 2021: [Judgment ]
  • November 01, 2021: [Sentencing ]
October, 2021
  • October 26, 2021: [Order on PROPOSED SEALED Motion]
  • October 25, 2021: [PROPOSED SEALED Motion]
  • October 25, 2021: [PROPOSED SEALED Document]
  • October 22, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
  • October 12, 2021: [Objection to PSI]
  • October 07, 2021: [Objection to PSI]
September, 2021
  • September 28, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report -Draft]
August, 2021
  • August 06, 2021: [Plea Agreement ]
  • August 06, 2021: [Arraignment ]
  • August 06, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • August 06, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
July, 2021
  • July 23, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • July 06, 2021: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct ]
June, 2021
  • June 28, 2021: [Motion Submitted]
  • June 28, 2021: [Amend/Correct ]
  • June 24, 2021: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • June 24, 2021: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • June 24, 2021: [Waiver-Other]
  • June 16, 2021: [Continue ]
  • June 16, 2021: [Docket Call]
  • June 16, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 15, 2021: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • June 09, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • June 09, 2021: [Continue ]
  • June 09, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 07, 2021: [Scheduling Order ]
  • June 07, 2021: [Text Order]
  • June 07, 2021: [Order of Detention - Temporary]
  • June 07, 2021: [Initial Appearance ]
  • June 07, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 07, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • June 07, 2021: [Detention]
  • June 07, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • June 04, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
April, 2021
  • April 28, 2021: [Arrest - Other District ]
  • April 28, 2021: [Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received ]
  • April 28, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
February, 2021
  • February 04, 2021: [Penalty Sheet]
  • February 04, 2021: [Unredacted Document]
  • February 04, 2021: [Warrant Requested]
  • February 04, 2021: [Warrant Issued ]
  • February 04, 2021: [Indictment ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.