U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cr-00056-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Nesbitt et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 21, 2025: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • May 01, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue Sentencing]
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Continue Sentencing]
  • April 23, 2025: [Notice of Hearing ]
March, 2025
  • March 13, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue Sentencing]
  • March 12, 2025: [Continue Sentencing]
January, 2025
  • January 06, 2025: [Seal Document]
October, 2024
  • October 07, 2024: [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
  • October 07, 2024: [Transcript]
  • October 07, 2024: [RESTRICTED Transcript]
December, 2022
  • December 15, 2022: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • December 15, 2022: [Seal Document]
  • December 15, 2022: [SEALED Motion]
  • December 15, 2022: [PROPOSED SEALED Motion]
  • December 15, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • December 08, 2022: [Continue ]
November, 2022
  • November 29, 2022: [Request for Discovery]
  • November 29, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • November 28, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • November 18, 2022: [Order on Ex Parte Motion to Seal]
  • November 17, 2022: [Ex Parte Motion to Seal]
  • November 17, 2022: [PROPOSED SEALED Motion]
  • November 16, 2022: [Docket Call]
  • November 16, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 15, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • November 10, 2022: [Appoint Counsel ]
  • November 09, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • November 08, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • November 07, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
October, 2022
  • October 19, 2022: [Order on Ex Parte Motion to Seal]
  • October 18, 2022: [Ex Parte Motion to Seal]
  • October 18, 2022: [PROPOSED SEALED Motion]
September, 2022
  • September 30, 2022: [SEALED Order]
  • September 28, 2022: [Ex Parte Motion to Seal]
  • September 28, 2022: [PROPOSED SEALED Motion]
  • September 27, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • September 27, 2022: [Continue ]
  • September 26, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • September 23, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • September 08, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • September 08, 2022: [Continue ]
August, 2022
  • August 30, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • August 04, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • August 03, 2022: [Continue ]
July, 2022
  • July 22, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
June, 2022
  • June 29, 2022: [Order on Ex Parte Motion to Seal]
  • June 28, 2022: [Ex Parte Motion to Seal]
  • June 28, 2022: [PROPOSED SEALED Motion]
  • June 23, 2022: [Objection to PSI]
  • June 02, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • June 02, 2022: [Continue ]
May, 2022
  • May 24, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • May 19, 2022: [Request for Discovery]
  • May 19, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 09, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • May 09, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
April, 2022
  • April 07, 2022: [Order on PROPOSED SEALED Motion]
  • April 07, 2022: [Order on Ex Parte Motion to Seal]
  • April 06, 2022: [Ex Parte Motion to Seal]
  • April 06, 2022: [PROPOSED SEALED Motion]
March, 2022
  • March 23, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • March 22, 2022: [Continue ]
  • March 21, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
January, 2022
  • January 27, 2022: [Order on Ex Parte Motion to Seal]
  • January 26, 2022: [Ex Parte Motion to Seal]
  • January 26, 2022: [PROPOSED SEALED Motion]
  • January 24, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • January 19, 2022: [Continue ]
  • January 15, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 12, 2022: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel - USA]
  • January 07, 2022: [Objection to PSI]
December, 2021
  • December 22, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • December 21, 2021: [Motion Referred]
  • December 21, 2021: [Continue ]
  • December 21, 2021: [Request for Discovery]
  • December 20, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • December 20, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • December 17, 2021: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • December 15, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • December 14, 2021: [Response in Opposition]
  • December 07, 2021: [Order - Written Order Following Oral Order on Motion]
  • December 06, 2021: [Exhibit List ]
  • December 06, 2021: [Motion Hearing ]
  • December 06, 2021: [Order on Motion to Suppress ]
  • December 06, 2021: [Order on Motion for Hearing ]
  • December 06, 2021: [Order on Motion to Quash ]
  • December 03, 2021: [Quash ]
  • December 03, 2021: [Notice-other]
  • December 02, 2021: [Order on Ex Parte Motion to Seal]
  • December 02, 2021: [Order on PROPOSED SEALED Motion]
  • December 01, 2021: [Ex Parte Motion to Seal]
  • December 01, 2021: [PROPOSED SEALED Motion]
November, 2021
  • November 30, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 29, 2021: [Hearing ]
  • November 10, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • November 10, 2021: [Continue ]
  • November 04, 2021: [Set/Reset Motion and M&R Hearings]
  • November 04, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • November 03, 2021: [Continue ]
  • November 01, 2021: [Order on Motion for Protective Order ]
October, 2021
  • October 27, 2021: [Protective Order ]
  • October 25, 2021: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • October 25, 2021: [Order on PROPOSED SEALED Motion]
  • October 25, 2021: [Order on Ex Parte Motion to Seal]
  • October 25, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report -Draft]
  • October 25, 2021: [Notice of Hearing on Motion ]
  • October 25, 2021: [Order on Motion to Dismiss ]
  • October 22, 2021: [Ex Parte Motion to Seal]
  • October 22, 2021: [PROPOSED SEALED Motion]
  • October 20, 2021: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • October 20, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • October 19, 2021: [Continue ]
  • October 15, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 15, 2021: [Response to Motion]
  • October 14, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • October 01, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
September, 2021
  • September 30, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • September 27, 2021: [Response to Motion]
  • September 16, 2021: [Suppress ]
  • September 13, 2021: [Dismiss ]
  • September 09, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • September 09, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • September 08, 2021: [Extension of Time]
  • September 08, 2021: [Continue ]
  • September 01, 2021: [Order on PROPOSED SEALED Motion]
  • September 01, 2021: [Order on Ex Parte Motion to Seal]
August, 2021
  • August 31, 2021: [Ex Parte Motion to Seal]
  • August 31, 2021: [PROPOSED SEALED Motion]
  • August 31, 2021: [Plea Agreement ]
  • August 31, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • August 31, 2021: [Arraignment ]
  • August 31, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 25, 2021: [Release Status Report]
  • August 10, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • August 10, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • August 09, 2021: [Extension of Time]
  • August 09, 2021: [Continue ]
  • August 03, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
July, 2021
  • July 12, 2021: [Order on PROPOSED SEALED Motion]
  • July 12, 2021: [Order on Ex Parte Motion to Seal]
  • July 12, 2021: [Ex Parte Motion to Seal]
  • July 12, 2021: [PROPOSED SEALED Motion]
  • July 09, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • July 09, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • July 08, 2021: [Extension of Time]
  • July 08, 2021: [Continue ]
  • July 08, 2021: [Order on PROPOSED SEALED Motion]
  • July 08, 2021: [Order on Ex Parte Motion to Seal]
  • July 07, 2021: [Ex Parte Motion to Seal]
  • July 07, 2021: [PROPOSED SEALED Motion]
  • July 06, 2021: [Release Status Report]
June, 2021
  • June 30, 2021: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • June 29, 2021: [Appoint Counsel ]
  • June 25, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • June 22, 2021: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • June 08, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • June 08, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • June 07, 2021: [Extension of Time]
  • June 07, 2021: [Continue ]
May, 2021
  • May 13, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • May 13, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • May 12, 2021: [Continue ]
  • May 12, 2021: [Extension of Time]
  • May 07, 2021: [Appoint Counsel ]
April, 2021
  • April 27, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • April 27, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • April 27, 2021: [Continue ]
  • April 27, 2021: [Extension of Time]
  • April 14, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • April 14, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • April 14, 2021: [Motion Submitted]
  • April 13, 2021: [Extension of Time]
  • April 13, 2021: [Continue ]
  • April 08, 2021: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • April 08, 2021: [Detention Hearing ]
  • April 08, 2021: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
  • April 01, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • April 01, 2021: [Continue ]
  • April 01, 2021: [Docket Call]
  • April 01, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 01, 2021: [Pretrial Services Report]
March, 2021
  • March 31, 2021: [Request for Discovery]
  • March 31, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 30, 2021: [Scheduling Order ]
  • March 29, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • March 29, 2021: [Order of Detention - Temporary]
  • March 29, 2021: [Text Order]
  • March 29, 2021: [Initial Appearance ]
  • March 29, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 29, 2021: [Detention]
  • March 29, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • March 29, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • March 29, 2021: [Arrest ]
  • March 26, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 03, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • March 03, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • March 02, 2021: [Motion Submitted]
  • March 02, 2021: [Continue ]
  • March 02, 2021: [Extension of Time]
February, 2021
  • February 12, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • February 11, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release ]
  • February 11, 2021: [Request for Discovery]
  • February 11, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • February 10, 2021: [Scheduling Order ]
  • February 10, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release ]
  • February 10, 2021: [Unredacted Document]
  • February 10, 2021: [Initial Appearance ]
  • February 10, 2021: [Order]
  • February 10, 2021: [Oral Order]
  • February 10, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • February 10, 2021: [Arrest ]
  • February 10, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • February 09, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 04, 2021: [Penalty Sheet]
  • February 04, 2021: [Warrant Requested]
  • February 04, 2021: [Warrant Issued ]
  • February 04, 2021: [Indictment ]
  • February 04, 2021: [Unredacted Document]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.