U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cr-00055-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Cannady
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 20, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue Sentencing]
  • May 20, 2025: [Continue Sentencing]
  • May 06, 2025: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel - USA]
April, 2025
  • April 23, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue Sentencing]
  • April 21, 2025: [Continue Sentencing]
  • April 16, 2025: [Letter]
  • April 14, 2025: [Letter]
January, 2023
  • January 12, 2023: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued ]
  • January 12, 2023: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
December, 2022
  • December 02, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
November, 2022
  • November 30, 2022: [Continue ]
  • November 21, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued ]
  • November 21, 2022: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
October, 2022
  • October 26, 2022: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel - USA]
  • October 21, 2022: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel - USA]
  • October 11, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • October 07, 2022: [Continue ]
July, 2022
  • July 28, 2022: [Continue ]
  • July 28, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued ]
  • July 27, 2022: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
June, 2022
  • June 23, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • June 22, 2022: [Continue ]
  • June 13, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued ]
  • June 13, 2022: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
April, 2022
  • April 20, 2022: [Continue ]
March, 2022
  • March 28, 2022: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel - USA]
  • March 02, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • March 01, 2022: [Continue ]
February, 2022
  • February 24, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued ]
  • February 24, 2022: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
December, 2021
  • December 21, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • December 17, 2021: [Continue ]
October, 2021
  • October 27, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • October 25, 2021: [Continue ]
September, 2021
  • September 14, 2021: [Continue ]
  • September 14, 2021: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel - USA]
  • September 08, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued ]
  • September 07, 2021: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
August, 2021
  • August 11, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • August 10, 2021: [Continue ]
  • August 06, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued ]
  • August 06, 2021: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
June, 2021
  • June 25, 2021: [Continue ]
  • June 23, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued ]
  • June 23, 2021: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
May, 2021
  • May 26, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • May 25, 2021: [Continue ]
  • May 19, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued ]
  • May 19, 2021: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
April, 2021
  • April 13, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • April 12, 2021: [Motion Submitted]
  • April 12, 2021: [Continue ]
  • April 05, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
February, 2021
  • February 22, 2021: [Order - Written Order Following Oral Order on Motion]
  • February 22, 2021: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • February 22, 2021: [Exhibit List ]
  • February 22, 2021: [Detention Hearing ]
  • February 22, 2021: [Scheduling Order ]
  • February 19, 2021: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • February 17, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued ]
  • February 17, 2021: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • February 16, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • February 16, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • February 16, 2021: [Scheduling Order ]
  • February 16, 2021: [Text Order]
  • February 16, 2021: [Order of Detention - Temporary]
  • February 16, 2021: [Initial Appearance ]
  • February 16, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 16, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • February 16, 2021: [Detention]
  • February 16, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • February 16, 2021: [Arrest ]
  • February 12, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued ]
  • February 12, 2021: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • February 12, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 04, 2021: [Warrant Issued ]
  • February 04, 2021: [Penalty Sheet]
  • February 04, 2021: [Indictment ]
  • February 04, 2021: [Unredacted Document]
  • February 04, 2021: [Warrant Requested]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.