U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cr-00054-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Hartsfield
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2021
  • December 27, 2021: [Transcript - Appeal]
  • December 08, 2021: [USCA Order]
  • December 03, 2021: [Appeal Remark]
November, 2021
  • November 18, 2021: [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
  • November 18, 2021: [Transcript - Appeal]
October, 2021
  • October 15, 2021: [USCA Order]
  • October 15, 2021: [USCA Case Number ]
  • October 12, 2021: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • October 10, 2021: [Amended Judgment]
  • October 05, 2021: [Judgment ]
  • October 04, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 04, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 04, 2021: [Sentencing ]
September, 2021
  • September 22, 2021: [Order]
  • September 14, 2021: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel - USA]
August, 2021
  • August 27, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
  • August 18, 2021: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • August 17, 2021: [Order]
  • August 04, 2021: [Objection to PSI]
July, 2021
  • July 21, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report -Draft]
May, 2021
  • May 12, 2021: [Order Setting/Resetting Hearings]
  • May 12, 2021: [Consent to Magistrate Arraignment]
  • May 12, 2021: [Arraignment ]
  • May 12, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
March, 2021
  • March 10, 2021: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • March 10, 2021: [Detention Hearing ]
  • March 10, 2021: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
  • March 10, 2021: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • March 08, 2021: [Request for Discovery]
  • March 08, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 05, 2021: [Scheduling Order ]
  • March 05, 2021: [Order of Detention - Temporary]
  • March 05, 2021: [Initial Appearance ]
  • March 05, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 05, 2021: [Text Order]
  • March 05, 2021: [Oral Order]
  • March 05, 2021: [Detention]
  • March 05, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • March 05, 2021: [Arrest ]
  • March 05, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • March 04, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
February, 2021
  • February 04, 2021: [Penalty Sheet]
  • February 04, 2021: [Unredacted Document]
  • February 04, 2021: [Warrant Requested]
  • February 04, 2021: [Warrant Issued ]
  • February 04, 2021: [Indictment ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.