U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00056-1
  • Case Name: USA v. MATHIS
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2021
  • December 01, 2021: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
July, 2021
  • July 22, 2021: [SEALED Statement of Reasons]
  • July 22, 2021: [Judgment]
June, 2021
  • June 28, 2021: [Sentencing]
  • June 22, 2021: [Sentencing Memorandum - SEALED]
May, 2021
  • May 26, 2021: [SEALED Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
  • May 07, 2021: [SEALED Response to Draft PSR - NOTICE TO PROBATION AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
April, 2021
  • April 28, 2021: [SEALED Response to Draft PSR - NOTICE TO PROBATION AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • April 23, 2021: [SEALED Draft Presentence Investigation Report]
February, 2021
  • February 05, 2021: [Order Appointing Panel Attorney]
  • February 05, 2021: [Arraignment ]
  • February 05, 2021: [Plea Agreement Hearing]
  • February 05, 2021: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • February 05, 2021: [CJA 23 - Financial Affidavit-SEALED]
  • February 05, 2021: [Notice of Related Case]
  • February 05, 2021: [Case Reassigned]
  • February 04, 2021: [Factual Basis Document]
  • February 04, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
  • February 04, 2021: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.