U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:20-cr-00244-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Bernal-Salinas
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 06, 2022: [Memorandum Opinion ]
August, 2022
  • August 10, 2022: [Judgment ]
  • August 09, 2022: [Order to Surrender]
  • August 09, 2022: [Sentencing ]
  • August 02, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
April, 2022
  • April 22, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • April 22, 2022: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • April 01, 2022: [Order on PROPOSED SEALED Motion]
  • April 01, 2022: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
March, 2022
  • March 31, 2022: [Seal Document]
  • March 31, 2022: [PROPOSED SEALED Motion]
  • March 29, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • March 17, 2022: [Objection to PSI]
  • March 03, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report -Draft]
January, 2022
  • January 18, 2022: [Notice-other]
  • January 18, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
December, 2021
  • December 17, 2021: [PETITION and ORDER for Action on Pretrial Release]
October, 2021
  • October 12, 2021: [Order for Forfeiture of Property]
  • October 12, 2021: [Arraignment ]
  • October 12, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 12, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • October 06, 2021: [Release Status Report]
  • October 04, 2021: [Amended Penalty Sheet]
  • October 04, 2021: [Notice Regarding US Passport]
  • October 01, 2021: [Information - Felony]
  • October 01, 2021: [Penalty Sheet]
September, 2021
  • September 29, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • September 13, 2021: [Proposed Order]
August, 2021
  • August 03, 2021: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Document ]
  • August 03, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • August 03, 2021: [Continue ]
  • August 03, 2021: [Leave to File Document ]
  • August 03, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
July, 2021
  • July 20, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • July 08, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • July 02, 2021: [Continue ]
June, 2021
  • June 29, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • June 07, 2021: [Order - Written Order Following Oral Order on Motion]
  • June 07, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • June 07, 2021: [Docket Call]
  • June 07, 2021: [Continue ]
  • June 03, 2021: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel- Defendant]
May, 2021
  • May 25, 2021: [Release Status Report]
  • May 24, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
April, 2021
  • April 23, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • April 23, 2021: [Motion Submitted]
  • April 23, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • April 23, 2021: [Continue ]
  • April 05, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 05, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
February, 2021
  • February 16, 2021: [Text Order]
  • February 12, 2021: [Order]
  • February 12, 2021: [Notice-other]
  • February 12, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release ]
  • February 12, 2021: [Detention Hearing ]
  • February 11, 2021: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • February 11, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • February 11, 2021: [Request for Discovery]
  • February 10, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • February 10, 2021: [Scheduling Order ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.