U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00003-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Queriapa
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
July, 2021
  • July 28, 2021: [Judgment Returned Executed]
  • July 13, 2021: [Transcript - Appeal]
June, 2021
  • June 01, 2021: [Judgment - Revocation Proceedings]
May, 2021
  • May 27, 2021: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
March, 2021
  • March 23, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • March 08, 2021: [Oral or Text-Only Order]
  • March 08, 2021: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
  • March 08, 2021: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • March 08, 2021: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • March 08, 2021: [Oral Order Appointing Counsel]
  • March 08, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • March 08, 2021: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • March 05, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • March 05, 2021: [Arrest]
February, 2021
  • February 25, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • February 11, 2021: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • February 10, 2021: [Transfer In/Probationer]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.