U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cr-00069-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Benson
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 30, 2022: [Notice-other]
  • December 30, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
October, 2021
  • October 05, 2021: [Judgment ]
  • October 05, 2021: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • October 05, 2021: [Sentencing ]
September, 2021
  • September 10, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
August, 2021
  • August 18, 2021: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • August 17, 2021: [Order]
  • August 13, 2021: [Objection to PSI]
July, 2021
  • July 30, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report -Draft]
  • July 22, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
May, 2021
  • May 25, 2021: [Order Setting/Resetting Hearings]
  • May 25, 2021: [Consent to Magistrate Arraignment]
  • May 25, 2021: [Arraignment ]
  • May 25, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • May 10, 2021: [Letter]
March, 2021
  • March 26, 2021: [Order]
  • March 26, 2021: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • March 26, 2021: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
  • March 26, 2021: [Detention Hearing ]
  • March 25, 2021: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • March 24, 2021: [Request for Discovery]
  • March 24, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 24, 2021: [Scheduling Order ]
  • March 23, 2021: [Order of Detention - Temporary]
  • March 23, 2021: [Initial Appearance ]
  • March 23, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 23, 2021: [Text Order]
  • March 23, 2021: [Oral Order]
  • March 23, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • March 23, 2021: [Detention]
  • March 23, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • March 23, 2021: [Arrest ]
  • March 23, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • March 22, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
February, 2021
  • February 11, 2021: [Warrant Issued ]
  • February 11, 2021: [Penalty Sheet]
  • February 11, 2021: [Unredacted Document]
  • February 11, 2021: [Warrant Requested]
  • February 11, 2021: [Indictment ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.