U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 7:21-cr-00024-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Smith
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2021
  • September 07, 2021: [Judgment ]
  • September 01, 2021: [Sentencing ]
August, 2021
  • August 23, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
  • August 17, 2021: [Objection to PSI]
  • August 11, 2021: [Objection to PSI]
July, 2021
  • July 27, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report -Draft]
June, 2021
  • June 03, 2021: [Plea Agreement ]
  • June 03, 2021: [Arraignment ]
  • June 03, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 03, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
April, 2021
  • April 15, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • April 14, 2021: [Motion Submitted]
  • April 14, 2021: [Continue ]
  • April 12, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
February, 2021
  • February 22, 2021: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • February 22, 2021: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
  • February 22, 2021: [Detention Hearing ]
  • February 22, 2021: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • February 20, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • February 18, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • February 18, 2021: [Scheduling Order ]
  • February 18, 2021: [Motion Referred]
  • February 18, 2021: [Continue ]
  • February 17, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • February 16, 2021: [Text Order]
  • February 16, 2021: [Oral Order]
  • February 16, 2021: [Order of Detention - Temporary]
  • February 16, 2021: [Detention]
  • February 16, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • February 16, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • February 16, 2021: [Initial Appearance ]
  • February 16, 2021: [Arrest ]
  • February 12, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 11, 2021: [Warrant Issued ]
  • February 11, 2021: [Penalty Sheet]
  • February 11, 2021: [Notice of Related Case]
  • February 11, 2021: [Warrant Requested]
  • February 11, 2021: [Indictment ]
  • February 11, 2021: [Unredacted Document]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.