U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 7:21-cr-00023-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Taylor
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2024
  • October 06, 2024: [Request for Discovery]
  • October 06, 2024: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 04, 2024: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • October 04, 2024: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • October 04, 2024: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
November, 2021
  • November 23, 2021: [Judgment ]
  • November 22, 2021: [Sentencing ]
  • November 09, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
October, 2021
  • October 15, 2021: [Objection to PSI]
  • October 01, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report -Draft]
July, 2021
  • July 27, 2021: [Arraignment ]
  • July 27, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • July 08, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
May, 2021
  • May 28, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • May 26, 2021: [Order - Written Order Following Oral Order on Motion]
  • May 26, 2021: [Detention Hearing ]
  • May 26, 2021: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • May 25, 2021: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • May 24, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • May 24, 2021: [Request for Discovery]
  • May 24, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 21, 2021: [Scheduling Order ]
  • May 21, 2021: [Order of Detention - Temporary]
  • May 21, 2021: [Initial Appearance ]
  • May 21, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 21, 2021: [Text Order]
  • May 21, 2021: [Detention]
  • May 21, 2021: [Oral Order]
  • May 21, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • May 21, 2021: [Arrest ]
  • May 18, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
February, 2021
  • February 11, 2021: [Penalty Sheet]
  • February 11, 2021: [Unredacted Document]
  • February 11, 2021: [Warrant Requested]
  • February 11, 2021: [Warrant Issued ]
  • February 11, 2021: [Indictment ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.